Cannady v. Dump et al
Plaintiff: Vincent N. Cannady
Defendant: Harold L Dump, II, John Doe # 1, Missouri Department of Mental Health, Hugh C Jenkins, John Doe #2, Bates County Clerks Office, Melissa Miller, Jeffrey M Martin and Thomas G Pyle
Case Number: 3:2021cv05022
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of filing Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Appeal by Harold L Dump, II re #53 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Doherty, Mimi)
April 28, 2021 Filing 62 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #47 MOTION for recusal filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 5/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
April 28, 2021 Filing 61 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #48 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 5/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
April 28, 2021 Filing 60 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #51 MOTION to compel Discovery and Sanctions filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 5/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
April 27, 2021 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #51 MOTION to compel AND MOTION FOR DISCOVERY filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Reply suggestions due by 5/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Baker, David)
April 27, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of filing SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins re #49 Suggestions in Support of Motion (Baker, David)
April 27, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of filing SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (ALSO TITLED PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL) by Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins re #53 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Baker, David)
April 27, 2021 Filing 56 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #47 MOTION for recusal filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Reply suggestions due by 5/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David S. Baker)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Baker, David)
April 23, 2021 Filing 55 PRO SE MOTION for entry of default filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 23, 2021 Filing 54 PRO SE MOTION for default judgment filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 53 PRO SE NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Vincent N. Cannady. Filing fee $ 0.00, receipt number NOT PAID. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 52 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re #51 MOTION to compel on behalf of Plaintiff Vincent N. Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 51 PRO SE MOTION to compel filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 50 PRO SE MOTION for default judgment filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 49 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re #48 MOTION for summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Vincent N. Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 48 PRO SE MOTION for summary judgment filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
April 16, 2021 Filing 47 PRO SE MOTION for recusal filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra) Modified on 4/20/2021 adding name of filer to docket text (Siegert, Karen).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - DENYING #13 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. DENYING #37 plaintiff's motion for discovery. GRANTING #38 plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to the motions to dismiss are due on or before April 26, 2021. GRANTING #21 defendant's motion to stay. This matter is STAYED pending the Court's ruling on the motions to dismiss. GRANTING #23 defendant Pyle's motion to quash subpoena. GRANTING #26 defendant Dump's motion for extension of time to respond to written discovery. GRANTING #28 defendant Jenkins and Bates County Clerk's Office motion to quash subpoenas. Signed on 4/9/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)Copy of Order mailed via first class mail to Vincent N. Cannady at 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Springs, MO 64733.
April 5, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Chief District Judge Beth Phillips to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 21-5022-CV-SW-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is related to another case previously assigned to the Honorable Brian C. Wimes. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9 and with Judge Wimes's consent, this case is transferred to Judge Wimes for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/5/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 2, 2021 Filing 43 RESPONSE to motion re #38 MOTION for extension of time filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 4/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Doherty, Mimi)
April 2, 2021 Filing 42 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #37 MOTION for discovery filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Reply suggestions due by 4/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Baker, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of filing Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to the Filing of Bates County Docket by Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins (Baker, David)
April 2, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE to motion re #38 MOTION for extension of time filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Reply suggestions due by 4/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baker, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 39 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #37 MOTION for discovery filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 4/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
March 30, 2021 Filing 38 PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to answer motion to dismiss and all other objections filed by defendant Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Filing 37 PRO SE MOTION for discovery filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Material filed in support, #2 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Filing 36 PRO SE NOTICE of filing Objection to the filing of Bates County Docket by Vincent N. Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Material filed in support, #2 Envelope)(Melvin, Greg)
March 30, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to motion re #21 MOTION to stay filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendant Thomas G Pyle. Reply suggestions due by 4/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blanton, Mark)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Attorney Mark D. Blanton's motion to withdraw as attorney for Defendant The Honorable Harold Dump is GRANTED. Signed on 3/24/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) Modified on 3/25/2021 A copy of this NEF was mailed to Vincent N. Cannady, 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Springs, MO 64733 on 3/25/2021. (Siegert, Karen).
March 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (A copy of this NEF was mailed to Vincent N. Cannady, 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Springs, MO 64733 on 3/24/2021.) (Melvin, Greg)
March 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 21-5022-CV-SW-BP. (A copy of the NEF for this notice of reassignment was mailed to Vincent N. Cannady, 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Springs, MO 64733 on 3/23/2021.) (Melvin, Greg)
March 23, 2021 Filing 32 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendant Thomas G Pyle. Reply suggestions due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Blanton, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Harold L Dump, II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blanton, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULE 16 NOTICE. The Rule 26(f) conference shall take place by no later than 4/23/2021. The parties' proposed scheduling order shall be filed by no later than 5/7/2021. (See Order for additional details.) Signed on 3/23/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff from Chambers.) (Kitsmiller, Julia)
March 23, 2021 Filing 29 SUGGESTIONS in support re #28 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Issued to Defendants Jenkins and Bates County Clerk's Office filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Hugh Jenkins, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Bates County Clerk's Office)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Baker, David)
March 23, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to quash Subpoenas Issued to Defendants Jenkins and Bates County Clerk's Office filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Hugh Jenkins, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Bates County Clerk's Office)(Baker, David)
March 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION for preliminary injunction relief filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
March 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Harold L Dump, II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Doherty, Mimi)
March 23, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to motion re #21 MOTION to stay filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Doherty, Mimi)
March 23, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Harold L Dump, II (Attorney Mimi Elizabeth Doherty added to party Harold L Dump, II(pty:dft))(Doherty, Mimi)
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Thomas G Pyle. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blanton, Mark)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in support re #21 MOTION to stay filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Baker, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to stay filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baker, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in support re #19 MOTION to dismiss party MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendants Harold L Dump, II, Thomas G Pyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Blanton, Mark)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss party , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Harold L Dump, II, Thomas G Pyle. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blanton, Mark)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Harold L Dump, II. Reply suggestions due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case.net Docket Sheet)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Baker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2021: #2 Exhibit B) (Crocker, Susan).
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION to dismiss party filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Baker, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss party filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Bates County Clerks Office, Harold L Dump, II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney David S. Baker added to party Harold L Dump, II(pty:dft))(Baker, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins.(Baker, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Harold L Dump, II, Thomas G Pyle (Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Harold L Dump, II(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Thomas G Pyle(pty:dft))(Blanton, Mark)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Melvin, Greg)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION for ECF user ID and password filed by Vincent N. Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by David S. Baker on behalf of Bates County Clerks Office, Hugh C Jenkins (Attorney David S. Baker added to party Bates County Clerks Office(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Hugh C Jenkins(pty:dft))(Baker, David)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Complaint About a Missouri Judge (Ruth Cannady) by Vincent N. Cannady (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Complaint About a Missouri Judge by Vincent N. Cannady (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Se NOTICE of filing Amended Supplemental Statement of Claim by Vincent N. Cannady (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vincent N. Cannady. Bates County Clerks Office served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vincent N. Cannady. Hugh C Jenkins served on 3/3/2021, (Clerk's Office Note: Note on Proof of Service Form indicates the documents were faxed and emailed to Hugh Jenkins as Mr. Jenkins refused to accept summons.) answer due 3/24/2021. (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vincent N. Cannady. Thomas G Pyle served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vincent N. Cannady. Jeffrey M Martin served on 3/3/2021,(Clerk's Office Note: Note on Proof of Service form states that summons was faxed and emailed due to office of Jeffrey Martin being closed.) answer due 3/24/2021. (Woods, Gloria)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vincent N. Cannady. Missouri Department of Mental Health served - no date provided, answer due 3/31/2021. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 3/10/2021 to reflect (Clerk's Office Note: No date provided on the date the summons/complaint was served upon the Missouri Department of Mental Health.) (Woods, Gloria).
March 4, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Paper Notification of Magistrate Judge Assignment mailed to Vincent N. Cannady, 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Spring, MO 64733. (Keller, Jeanne).
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan) Mailed to Vincent N. Cannady, 17472 S 2950 Road, El Dorado Spring, MO 64733 on 3/4/2021 (Crocker, Susan). (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/15/2021) - Replaced document due to clerical error. NEF regenerated. Mailed the replacement copy of the MAP Notice of Inclusion to pro se plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (Woods, Gloria).
March 4, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bates County Clerks Office, John Doe # 1, John Doe #2, Harold L Dump, II, Hugh C Jenkins, Jeffrey M Martin, Melissa Miller, Missouri Department of Mental Health, Thomas G Pyle. (Crocker, Susan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bates County Clerks Office, John Doe # 1, John Doe #2, Harold L Dump, II, Hugh C Jenkins, Jeffrey M Martin, Melissa Miller, Missouri Department of Mental Health, Thomas G Pyle Vincent N. Cannady. Filing fee $402, receipt number KCMO088868. Service due by 6/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crocker, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannady v. Dump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent N. Cannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold L Dump, II
Represented By: Mimi Elizabeth Doherty
Represented By: David S. Baker
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh C Jenkins
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bates County Clerks Office
Represented By: David S. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G Pyle
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?