Gambrell et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Guy Gambrell, Jr and Fadilah Gambrell
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv05026
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed Acknowledgement filed by Fadilah Gambrell, Guy Gambrell, Jr. (Anderson, Bradley)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Guy Gambrell, Jr, Fadilah Gambrell. United States of America served on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Anderson, Bradley)
March 30, 2021 SUMMONSES (2) ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7346549. Service due by 6/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Anderson, Bradley) Modified on 3/24/2021 to correct docket text only. (Kern, Kendra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2021: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gambrell et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Gambrell, Jr
Represented By: Bradley S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fadilah Gambrell
Represented By: Bradley S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?