Montgomery v. Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kerry Montgomery
Defendant: Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05040
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Montgomery.(Montgomery, M. Scott)
June 21, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc. Defendants Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wolf, Timothy)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INTERIM SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines to join additional parties, amend pleadings, designate expert witnesses, and file motion for class certification. Signed on 6/16/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/15/21 as Document No. 18, Reply Suggestions to Motion. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document (Suggestions in Support of Motion). Counsel will refile the document using the correct event (Reply Suggestions to Motion). This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
June 15, 2021 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wolf, Timothy)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 6/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Wolf, Timothy)
June 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Benjamin S McIntosh on behalf of Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc. (Attorney Benjamin S McIntosh added to party Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.(pty:dft))(McIntosh, Benjamin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. (Wolf, Timothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Kerry Montgomery. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Montgomery, M. Scott)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by M. Scott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Montgomery. Reply suggestions due by 6/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Montgomery, M. Scott)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by Kerry Montgomery, Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by no later than 6/2/2021. Signed on 5/26/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 26, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 6/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Montgomery, M. Scott)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Wolf, Timothy)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wolf, Timothy)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
May 5, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc's Certificate of Interest filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. The parties shall hold their Rule 26 conference by no later than June 7, 2021, and file their joint proposed scheduling order by no later than June 21, 2021. (Please see Order for additional information.) Signed on 5/3/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiffs of Filing of Removal by Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Stone County Circuit Court of Filing of Removal by Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Stone County County, case number 21SN-CC00067, filed by Timothy J Wolf. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7398338. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Timothy)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff and defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 5/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Montgomery
Represented By: M. Scott Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Cove Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J Wolf
Represented By: Benjamin S McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?