Bryant v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Bryant
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Jane Doe Cashier
Case Number: 3:2021cv05068
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 10/12/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 9/27/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on August 18, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by John P. Rahoy on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attorney John P. Rahoy added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft))(Rahoy, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Edward William Zeidler, II on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Zeidler, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Zeidler, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Edward William Zeidler, II on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Zeidler, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zeidler, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Stone County, case number 21SN-CC00077, filed by Edward William Zeidler, II. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7538810. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court filing, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zeidler, Edward)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Bryant
Represented By: Tom A Kapstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Represented By: Edward William Zeidler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Cashier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?