Johnson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Dana Michelle Johnson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv05084
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Social Security complaint filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Plaintiffs social security brief due by 1/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Related document(s) #3 ) (Ray, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUBMISSION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 001 Certification Page, #2 002 Court Transcript Index, #3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 006 Non Disability Related Development, #7 007 Disability Related Development, #8 008 Medical Records Part 1, #9 009 Medical Records Part 2)(Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 10/19/2021 Social security answer due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 10/19/21; Atty General 10/19/21; ORC 10/20/21)(Young, Kelsey)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 21-5084-CV-SW-BP. (Melvin, Greg)
October 8, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Dana Michelle Johnson. (Filing fee $402 receipt number IFP) filed byKelsey Young on behalf of Dana Michelle Johnson. Service due by 1/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Kelsey)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORAL ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for electronically filing the Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). Signed on October 7, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Dana Michelle Johnson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kelsey Young added to party Dana Michelle Johnson(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey)
October 6, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Michelle Johnson
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?