Reese v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clifton Reese
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05087
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Case dismissed without prejudice. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (1) denying as moot Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. #23 ) and (2) granting motion to voluntarily dismiss case (Doc. #26 ). Signed on 12/3/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Consent MOTION to dismiss case filed by John L. Young on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Young, John)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed on 11/30/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Skelton, Sara)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Curtis R. Summers on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Summers, Curtis)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Curtis R. Summers on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Summers, Curtis)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Curtis R. Summers on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Summers, Curtis)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT INDEX as to the Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/4/21 by Clifton Reese. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT INDEX as to the Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/4/21 by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clifton Reese. (Young, John)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 11/4/2021 Counsel appearing for Plaintiff: John L. Young. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Curtis R. Summers, Dylan Murphy Long. Time in court: 2:13 pm to 4:18 pm. Proceedings held as noted on the record, including that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. [1-1] at 48-49) is DENIED. Written Order to follow. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #4 motion for hearing, held 11/4/2021. Signed on 11/4/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #4 MOTION for hearing Plaintiff's Corrected Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by John L. Young on behalf of Plaintiff Clifton Reese. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Young, John)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 20, #16 Exhibit 21, #17 Exhibit 22, #18 Exhibit 23, #19 Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit 27, #23 Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit 29)(Summers, Curtis) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/3/2021 at the request of counsel.) (Houston, Kiambu).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #4 MOTION for hearing Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by John L. Young on behalf of Plaintiff Clifton Reese. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Young, John)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST for Plaintiff by Clifton Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Tyson Correspondence regarding vaccination, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Religious Exemption, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's religious exemption, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's attorney's correspondence with Defendant)(Young, John)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) Any reply brief shall be filed on or before 11/3/2021 at 12:00 pm; and (2) witness and exhibit lists for the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction shall be filed no later than 5:00 pm on 11/3/2021. Signed on 11/1/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #4 MOTION for hearing filed by Curtis R. Summers on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Summers, Curtis)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file brief with additional pages. Defendant may exceed the page limitation by up to and including two pages. Signed on 11/1/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/1/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/15/2021. Signed on November 1, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file Brief with Additional Pages filed by Curtis R. Summers on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Summers, Curtis)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE to motion for Removal to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri filed by John L. Young on behalf of Plaintiff Clifton Reese. Reply suggestions due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Young, John)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/4/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Skelton, Sara)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. [1-1] at 48-49) on or before 5:00 p.m. on 11/1/2021. Signed on 10/29/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for hearing filed by John L. Young on behalf of Clifton Reese. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Young, John)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 3:21-05087-CV-S-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Barry County, case number 21BR-CC00091, filed by Curtis R. Summers. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7648443. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summers, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Reese
Represented By: John L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Summers
Represented By: Dylan Murphy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?