Hawa-Pritchett v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv05100
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by plaintiff, Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett and defendant, Kilolo Kijakazi. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal) Modified on 1/28/2022 to reflect NEF mailed mailed to Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett at 962 Stoneridge Center Rd, Reeds Springs, MO 65737 (Berner, Crystal).
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 ***Remark USM-285 receipt from US Marshal Service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett. (Filing fee $0 receipt number IFP) Service due by 3/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 12/6/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel) Modified on 12/6/2021 to reflect copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca).
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF mailed to Plaintiff at 962 Stoneridge Center Rd, Reeds Spring, MO 65737. (Furtak, Rebecca)
December 6, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 12/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawa-Pritchett v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon S. Hawa-Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?