State of Missouri v. Smith
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Defendant: Donnie Dewayne Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv05107
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Doc. #18 to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #5 Notice of Appeal. Copy mailed to Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734. (Siegert, Karen)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed on 2/15/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) (Clerk's Note: A copy of this Order was mailed via 1st class mail to: Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734.)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION for leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Defendant Donnie Dewayne Smith. Reply suggestions due by 3/1/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Houston, Kiambu)
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk of Court, 8th USC. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal IFP and supporting documents forwarded to district court for a ruling. (Keller, Jeanne)
February 1, 2022 Filing 16 PRO SE MOTION for leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Donnie Dewayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Houston, Kiambu)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (CLERK'S NOTE: All documents pertaining to this case are on CM/ECF. Nothing will be sent to the Court of Appeals.) (Keller, Jeanne)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 01/27/2022, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 USCA Case Number from 8th USCA is 22-1047 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnie Dewayne Smith. No Briefing Schedule entered by the Court of Appeals. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 7, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 1/7/2022 as Document No. 12, USCA Case Number, No. 13 Order, and No. 14 Order. The documents have been deleted as they were duplicate filings to Document Nos. 9, 10 and 11. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (CLERK'S NOTE: All documents pertaining to this case are on CM/ECF. Nothing will be sent to the Court of Appeals.) (Keller, Jeanne)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 01/27/2022, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 USCA Case Number from 8th USCA is 22-1047 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnie Dewayne Smith. No Briefing Schedule entered by the Court of Appeals. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 GREEN CARD showing return of certified mail re #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Circuit Clerk of Lawrence County received 1/5/2022. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Siegert, Karen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 motion for reconsideration. Signed on 1/6/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)(Clerk's Note: A copy of this Order was mailed via 1st class mail to Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734.)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #5 Notice of Appeal. NEF mailed to Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Clerk's Judgment by Donnie Dewayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). NEF mailed to Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for reconsideration re #3 Clerk's Judgment filed by Donnie Dewayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #3 ) NEF mailed to Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 3, 2022 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested 7014 1200 0000 4261 3944 (Siegert, Karen)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Richard, Tracey) (A copy of this document and document #2 were mailed via 1st class mail to: Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734.)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 It is ORDERED that: (1) this case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. The following state court case is hereby remanded: State of Missouri v. Donnie D. Smith, State Court Case No. 19LW-CR01005; and (2) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. Signed on 12/30/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lawrence County County, case number 19LW-CR01005, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Brief in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Envelope) NEF mailed to Donnie D. Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, Arkansas 72734. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/28/2021 with correct Notice of Removal. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2021: #6 Cover Letter) (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Dewayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?