State of Missouri v. Smith
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Defendant: Donnie Dewayne Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv05108
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 GREEN CARD showing return of certified mail re #2 Order. Circuit Clerk of Lawrence County received on 1/5/22. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Siegert, Karen)
January 3, 2022 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested 7014 1200 0000 4261 3944 (Siegert, Karen)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Richard, Tracey) (A copy of this document and document #2 were mailed via 1st class mail to: Donnie Dewayne Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, AR 72734.)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 It is ORDERED that: (1) this case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. The following state court case is remanded: State of Missouri v. Donnie D. Smith, State Court Case No. 19LW-CR00352; and (2) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Missouri. Signed on 12/30/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lawrence County, case number 19LW-CR00352, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Brief in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Envelope)NEF mailed to Donnie D. Smith, 188 Bowen Blvd., #234, Goshen, Arkansas 72734. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2021: #6 Cover Letter) (Furtak, Rebecca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Dewayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?