Shearer v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jason Shearer
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv05008
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 2/18/2022 Social security answer due by 4/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 5/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 2/18/22; ORC 2/18/22; Atty General 2/25/22)(Young, Kelsey)
February 16, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Jason Shearer. (Filing fee $402 receipt number IFP) filed byKelsey Young on behalf of Jason Shearer. Service due by 5/11/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Kelsey)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have twenty days from this date to electronically file the Complaint. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed on 2/10/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 22-5008-CV-SW-BP. (Melvin, Greg)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelsey Young on behalf of Jason Shearer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kelsey Young added to party Jason Shearer(pty:pla))(Young, Kelsey)
February 8, 2022 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 3/1/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shearer v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Shearer
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?