City of Kansas City, Missouri v. Housing & Economic Development Financial Corporation et al
Case Number: 4:2005cv00368
Filed: April 21, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Fenner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2422 ORDER Approving Receiver's Final Report 2410 . Signed on September 26, 2013 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Moore, Terri)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2392 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Old Northeast, Inc. claim (Doc. #200) and SCS of Kansas City, Inc. claim (Doc. #196). Signed on 5/29/13 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2039 AMENDED ORDER Approving Receiver's Fifty Eighth Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 1998 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner. Signed on 4/22/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2037 ORDER Approving Receiver's Sixtieth Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 2025 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner. Signed on 4/16/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2036 ORDER granting 2002 motion to Liquidate Certain Single Family Loans. Signed on 4/15/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2028 ORDER adopting 2024 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint, filed by City of Kansas City, Missouri. Signed on 4/13/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2015 ORDER granting 1996 motion for sanctions. Signed on 3/12/10 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1987 ORDER granting 1976 motion Authorizing Receiver to Provide Funding for Mothballing. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 12/15/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1980 ORDER granting 1978 motion for TRO Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 11/23/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1974 ORDER Approving Receiver's Fifty-Seventh Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 1971 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 10/22/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 ORDER Approving Receivers Recommendation for Adoption of Proposed Employee Separation Plan re 1959 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 10/1/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1967 ORDER Approving Receiver's Recommendation Authorizing Him to Forgive Certain Grantable Loans re 1963 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/30/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1966 ORDER granting 1946 motion to compel Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Claim. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/25/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1965 ORDER Approving Receiver's Corrected Recommendation Regarding Destruction or Other Disposition of Inactive Records re 1954 Notice of filing, filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/21/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1961 ORDER Approving Receiver's Recommendation Regarding INsurance Coverages re 1948 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/11/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1958 AMENDED ORDER granting 1951 MOTION for order re 1883 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 1877 MOTION for order order authorizing Receiver to provide funding for minor home repair program in beacon hill to modify that Order by increasing funding limit for certain home filed by City of Kansas City, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/4/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 ORDER granting 1937 motion Authorizing the Receiver to Accelerate the Forgiveness of Certain Single Family Loans Pursuant to the City's Loan Forgiveness Policy. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 8/25/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 ORDER denying 1929 motion for Order Authorizing Receiver to Purchase Certain Real Property to Prevent Its Foreclosure Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 7/7/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1936 ORDER granting 1927 motion for order Withdrawing Claims Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 6/26/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 ORDER approving Receiver's Fifty-Third Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 1921 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 6/16/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1926 ORDER granting Receiver's Request for Order re 1918 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 6/9/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1906 ORDER approving Receiver's Fifty-First Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 1897 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/28/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 ORDER setting hearing for status conference, with hearing to be held on 5/15/2009 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/21/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1902 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting in part and denying in part claim of B&A Architecture LLC (Doc. #1662). Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/13/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1899 ORDER Allowing Claims of Jazz District re 1898 Stipulation filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/9/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1895 ORDER granting 1886 motion Authorizing Receiver to Donate Former Registry Square Apartments Parcels to Habitat for Humanity Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/3/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1894 ORDER approving Receiver's Forty-Ninth Recommendation Regarding Real Property re 1885 Notice of filing filed by David Bahner Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/2/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 ORDER granting 1881 motion Authorizing Receiver to Provide Funding for Acquisition of Certain Properties for Phase II Townhomes Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 3/26/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1883 ORDER granting 1877 motion Authorizing Receiver to Provide Funding to City for Targeted Minor Home Repair Program in Beacon Hill Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 3/10/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1818 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting claim of City of Kansas City, Missouri (Doc. #1659). Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 11/19/08. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1789 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying claim of Charlene McCorkle (Doc. #158) Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 10/10/08. (Mitchell, Lisa) Copy maild to Charlene McCorkle, 5614 Woodland Avenue, Kansas City, MO 64110 on 10/14/2008 (McDowell, Shelly).
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re the claim of Charlene McCorkle, Doc. No. 158. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer on 9/23/08. (Rollheiser, Sandy) Copy mailed to Charlene McCorkle, 5614 Woodland, Kansas City, MO 64110 on 9/24/2008 (McDowell, Shelly).
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting claims of Old Northeast, Inc. and SCS of Kansas City, Inc. (Docs. 200 and 196). Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 2/4/08. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/21/05. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Kansas City, Missouri v. Housing & Economic Development Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?