Filtration Solutions Worldwide, Inc. v. Gulf Coast Filters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Filtration Solutions Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: Gulf Coast Filters, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00102
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Fernando J. Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER - Filtration Solutions' claims for permanent injunction against Gulf Coast Filters are DENIED; Gulf Coast Filters' claims for permanent injunction against Filtration Solutions and Randy Fields are GRANTED as stated in order; and Gulf Coast's request for Attorney's fees is DENIED. Signed on 5/26/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER - (1) denying requests to perform additional demonstrations regarding the motor oil capacity of the GCF Model O-2 filter; (2) dismissing defendant's claim for statutory damages and attorneys' fees under the Copyright Act; (3) granting plaintiff's motion (submitted via email of 3/23) striking the Fasone Subpoenas; (4) partially striking the Fields Subpoena; and (5) provisionally denying plaintiff's request for fees and costs pending reconsideration at conclusion of this matter. Signed on 3/24/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER striking Paragraphs 14 and 15 of Radoumis affidavit (see 205 , 210 , 215 ). Signed on 3/1/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) Modified on 3/2/2010 to reflect order striking Paragraph 14 in addition to 15 of Radoumis affidavit. (Enss, Rhonda).
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER sustaining 183 motion in limine; sustaining 184 motion in limine; sustaining 185 motion in limine; sustaining 186 motion in limine; provisionally denying 190 motion in limine; sustaining 191 motion in limine; sustaining 192 motion in limine; provisionally denying 193 motion in limine; and sustaining 195 motion in limine. Signed by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. on 1/27/10. (Enss, Rhonda)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER - 1) Plaintiff's Challenge to Defendant's Designated Expert Kenny Jones 115 and Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions of Defendant's Designated Expert Kenny Jones 119 will be DENIED IN PART as they relate to par agraph 13 and all paragraphs not specifically mentioned in plaintiff's opening brief, and GRANTED IN PART in all other respects; 2) Plaintiff's Challenge to Defendant's Designated Expert Marina Radoumis 116 and Plaintiff's Daube rt Motion to Exclude Opinions of Defendant's Designated Expert Marina Radoumis 118 will be GRANTED IN PART as to paragraphs 9, 10(a)-(d), 11, and 12, and PROVISIONALLY DENIED IN PART as to paragraphs 14 and 15; however, defendant is to file th e advertising messages relevant to Ms. Radoumis opinions in paragraphs 14 and 15 on ECF on or before January 25, 2010; 3) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 126 is GRANTED IN PART as it relates to plaintiff's claims for monetary dama ges under the Lanham Act and plaintiff's claims for tortious interference with business expectancy, and DENIED IN PART as it relates to plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief under the Lanham Act; 4) Counter-Defendants' Motion for Su mmary Judgment 141 is GRANTED IN PART as it relates to counter-claimant's claims for monetary damages under the Lanham Act, for actual damages or disgorgement of profits as to GCF's copyright claims, and counter-claimant's claims for tortious interference with business expectancy, and is DENIED IN PART as it relates to counter-claimant's claims for injunctive relief under the Lanham Act and for statutory damages under the copyright act; 5) Counter-Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Affidavit of Jerry Sims and Suggestions in Support 169 is DENIED AS MOOT; 6) Parties shall submit executive summaries of their remaining claims as detailed in Section VI of this Order; and 7) trial setting of this matter is continued to April 5, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. on 1/12/10. (Enss, Rhonda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filtration Solutions Worldwide, Inc. v. Gulf Coast Filters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filtration Solutions Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard B. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Filters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?