Brandon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Minnie V Brandon
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Carlos R Medina
Case Number: 4:2008cv00706
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Insurance Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Gary A. Fenner
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 motion to remand. Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 9/18/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER dismissing claims against defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re 45 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 5/8/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 37 motion in limine Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/22/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER dismissing Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint re 41 Joint MOTION to dismiss case Joint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Signed by District Judge Gary A. Fenner on 3/24/09. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos R Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie V Brandon
Represented By: Daniel J. Matula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?