Deflecto, LLC v. Dundas*Jafine Inc.

Plaintiff: Deflecto, LLC
Defendant: Dundas*Jafine Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00116
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2015 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed on 12/22/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
November 4, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed on 11/4/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Re: 112 , 115 , 116 , 117 , 118 , and 134 motions.) (Matthes, Renea)
April 16, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed on 4/16/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
January 15, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith denying 69 Plaintiff Deflecto, LLC's Motion to Reconsider.(Matthes, Renea)
October 30, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith denying 23 Motion for preliminary injunction. (Matthes, Renea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deflecto, LLC v. Dundas*Jafine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deflecto, LLC
Represented By: Andrea M. Kimball
Represented By: Brian Richard McGinley
Represented By: Anne K Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dundas*Jafine Inc.
Represented By: Peter Knops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?