Combs et al v. Lounge KC, LLC., et al
Plaintiff: Dante A.R. Combs and Adam S Williams
Defendant: The Cordish Companies, Inc., Lounge KC, LLC, Entertainment Concepts Investors, LLC, First Response, Inc. and Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00227
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE. 343 , 344 . Signed on 3/23/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Bills of Costs. Signed on 8/28/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Wolfe, Steve)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 204 motion for summary judgment; granting 213 motion for summary judgment. Signed on 6/15/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Wolfe, Steve)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, 83 . Signed on 2/3/15 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count I is dismissed. Signed on 8/26/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Wolfe, Steve)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs et al v. Lounge KC, LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante A.R. Combs
Represented By: Linda S. Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cordish Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lounge KC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Concepts Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Response, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?