Faughn et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mark Faughn, Terrie Faughn, Marvin L Glass, Carolyn S Glass, Thomas McIntyre, Debbie McIntyre and Roger Sparks
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Case Number: 4:2014cv00245
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian C. Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 56 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 29, 2015 55 Featured Case IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. #54) is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 5/29/15 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 26, 2015 54 MOTION to dismiss case Without Prejudice filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holtsclaw, Rick)
May 14, 2015 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Holtsclaw, Rick)
April 9, 2015 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 unopposed motion for extension of time to re-file complaint. Signed on 4/9/15 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
April 7, 2015 51 Consent MOTION for extension of time to re-file Complaint filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/24/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holtsclaw, Rick)
March 31, 2015 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/30/15 as Document No. 49, Order, to correct typographical error and allowed sealed access to case participants. NEF regenerated. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 30, 2015 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment. Signed on 3/30/15 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 30, 2015 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Sealed Motion. Signed on 3/30/15 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) (Main Document 49 replaced on 3/31/2015) (Baldwin, Joella).
January 12, 2015 48 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF SEALED FILINGS) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D)(Davis, Gardiner)
December 19, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER - See order for details. Signed on 12/191/4 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Baldwin, Joella)
December 15, 2014 46 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 45 Notice(SEALED) FILED UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE (Davis, Gardiner)
December 15, 2014 45 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF SEALED FILING) (Davis, Gardiner)
November 13, 2014 44 STIPULATION (JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER -- PROPOSED ORDER ALSO TO BE EMAILED TO JUDGE'S CLERK PER LOCAL COURT RULE) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Gardiner)
October 9, 2014 43 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: Status Teleconference held on 10/9/2014. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 7, 2014 42 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Status Teleconference set for 10/9/2014 at 9:30 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Parties have been notified via e-mail of conference call-in numbers.(Baldwin, Joella)
July 23, 2014 41 SUR-REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion (Sealed) re 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark Faughn, Terrie Faughn, Carolyn S Glass, Marvin L Glass, Debbie McIntyre, Thomas McIntyre, Roger Sparks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 6/10/14 Order in SEC action, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - SEC's Opposition to Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 3/4/14 Order in Hollis v. Chase)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Holtsclaw, Rick) Modified on 7/24/2014 to correct event as to sur-reply (Wheeler, LaTandra).
July 9, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants Motion to Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their surreply on or before July 23, 2014. Signed on 07/09/2014 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Wells, Claudia)
July 9, 2014 39 MOTION for leave to file Surreply to Defendants Motion to Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/28/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holtsclaw, Rick)
July 2, 2014 38 NOTICE (SEALED) by Mark Faughn, Terrie Faughn, Carolyn S Glass, Marvin L Glass, Debbie McIntyre, Thomas McIntyre, Roger Sparks of Transmission of Sealed Documents from Hollis v. JPMorgan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hollis Order on Defendant's Motion for Cert.)(Holtsclaw, Rick)
June 30, 2014 37 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/30/2014. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 27, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney Courtney Worcester for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. ECF registration form emailed to counsel. Signed on 6/27/2014 by Clerk of Court. (Travis, Kendra)
June 27, 2014 35 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF SEALED FILINGS) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Davis, Gardiner)
June 27, 2014 34 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion (Sealed) re 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike (JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CLAW BACK CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS AND MOTION TO STRIKE) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel M. Blise)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Davis, Gardiner)
June 26, 2014 33 Motion to allow Courtney Worchester to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3999049) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Gardiner)
June 20, 2014 32 Featured Case IT IS ORDERED Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #31) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant shall file its reply brief on or before July 7, 2014. Signed on 6/20/14 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 20, 2014 31 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/10/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Davis, Gardiner)
June 13, 2014 30 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Appendix F, # 7 Appendix G, # 8 Appendix H)(Davis, Gardiner)
June 12, 2014 29 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/12/2014. Court sets an additional telephone Conference set for 6/30/2014 at 10:30 a.m.**, before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Parties have been notified of conference call-in numbers via e-mail. **PLEASE NOTE: The time set at today's hearing has changed from 10:00 a.m. to 10:30 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 10, 2014 28 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 25 MOTION for default judgment (JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Reply suggestions due by 6/27/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 25 ) (Davis, Gardiner)
June 2, 2014 27 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2014 at 8:30 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Parties will be notified via e-mail of conference participatin numbers.(Baldwin, Joella)
May 30, 2014 26 SUGGESTIONS in opposition (SEALED) re 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark Faughn, Terrie Faughn, Carolyn S Glass, Marvin L Glass, Debbie McIntyre, Thomas McIntyre, Roger Sparks. Reply suggestions due by 6/16/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Affidavit of Rick Holtsclaw, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Wise-Hoegel Indictment)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Holtsclaw, Rick)
May 29, 2014 25 MOTION for default judgment filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holtsclaw, Rick)
April 30, 2014 24 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ward, # 2 Affidavit Boland, # 3 Appendix A, # 4 Appendix B, # 5 Appendix C, # 6 Appendix D)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Davis, Gardiner)
April 30, 2014 23 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and to Strike filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davis, Gardiner)
April 29, 2014 22 NOTICE (SEALED) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA of Transmittal of Sealed Filings (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Appendix F)(Gattis, J.)
April 10, 2014 21 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held March 25, 2014 before Judge Brian C. Wimes. Court Reporter: Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. Number of pages: 41.(Halasey, Denise)
March 26, 2014 20 Featured Case IT IS ORDERED Defendants Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Motion To Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint (Doc. #9) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.s Sealed Motion to Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint (Doc. #12) is DENIED AS MOOT and WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See order for additional information. Signed on 3/26/14 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 26, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 , 16 and 17 motions to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Beth I. Z. Boland, Stephen J Quinlan, and Rachel M Blise for JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Copy of text Order and CM/ECF registration forms mailed to Attorneys. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Martin, Jan)
March 25, 2014 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/25/2014. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 25, 2014 17 Motion to allow Stephen J. Quinlan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3888327) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of All Defendants. (Davis, Gardiner)
March 25, 2014 16 Motion to allow Rachel M. Blise to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3888317) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of All Defendants. (Davis, Gardiner)
March 25, 2014 15 Motion to allow Beth I. Z. Boland to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3888293) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of All Defendants. (Davis, Gardiner)
March 25, 2014 14 NOTICE of appearance by J. Loyd Gattis, III on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Gattis, J.)
March 25, 2014 13 SUGGESTIONS in support (SEALED) re 12 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint filed by J. Loyd Gattis, III on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Gattis, J.)
March 25, 2014 12 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Claw Back Confidential Materials and Strike the Complaint filed by J. Loyd Gattis, III on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gattis, J.)
March 25, 2014 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/25/2014 as Document No. 11, Motion to Seal Document. The document has been deleted as it was inadvertently filed per J. Gattis, the filing party. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Chorny, Traci)
March 25, 2014 11 *document deleted- see the Notice of Docket Modification for further information* MOTION to seal document 1 Complaint,, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CLAW BACK CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS AND STRIKE THE COMPLAINT filed by J. Loyd Gattis, III on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Attorney J. Loyd Gattis, III added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA(pty:dft))(Gattis, J.) Modified on 3/25/2014 (Chorny, Traci).
March 24, 2014 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition (SEALED) re 6 Emergency MOTION to seal document 1 Complaint,, MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of Plaintiffs Mark Faughn, Terrie Faughn, Carolyn S Glass, Marvin L Glass, Debbie McIntyre, Thomas McIntyre, Roger Sparks. Reply suggestions due by 4/10/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rick Holtsclaw)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Holtsclaw, Rick)
March 24, 2014 9 MOTION for leave to file (MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CLAW BACK CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS AND STRIKE THE COMPLAINT) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davis, Gardiner)
March 19, 2014 8 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2014 at 1:00 p.m. before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Parties have been notified of dial-in information.(Baldwin, Joella)
March 19, 2014 7 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Defendants Sealed Emergency Motion to Impound Complaint and Exhibits. Until the Court resolves the privilege and confidentiality issues, the Court orders that the Complaint and Exhibits A and C shall remain under seal and that Plaintiffs shall maintain the confidentiality of those documents. The rest of the motion is denied. It is further ORDERED the parties shall appear for a teleconference on Tuesday, March 25, 2014, at 1:00 P.M.. Parties will be notified via e-mail of the conference dial-in information. Signed on 3/19/14 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 17, 2014 6 Emergency MOTION to seal document 1 Complaint,, , MOTION for Order (SEALED) filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/3/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Davis, Gardiner)
March 17, 2014 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 motion for leave to file. Signed on 3/17/14 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
March 17, 2014 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the the Honorable Gary A. Fenner, and at the direction of the Chief Judge, this case was randomly reassigned to the Honorable Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:14-00245-CV-W-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin)
March 14, 2014 3 MOTION for leave to file Emergency Motion to Impound Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal filed by Gardiner B. Davis on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2014 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Gardiner B. Davis added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA(pty:dft))(Davis, Gardiner)
March 14, 2014 2 NEW NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NEW NOTICE AND NEW MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Martin, Jan)
March 14, 2014 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case was randomly assigned to District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Please note the case number: 4:14-00245-CV-W-GAF. (Jones, Robin)
March 13, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rick D. Holtsclaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-3874608. Service due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Oct. 8, 2008 Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Hunter Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Stein Declaration, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet )(Holtsclaw, Rick) Modified on 3/14/2014 to correct receipt number (Jones, Robin). Modified on 3/14/2014 to restrict complaint and exhibits to case participants pending ruling on emergency motion (Jones, Robin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faughn et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Faughn
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Faughn
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L Glass
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Glass
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McIntyre
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie McIntyre
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sparks
Represented By: Rick D. Holtsclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Rachel M Blise
Represented By: Beth I. Z. Boland
Represented By: Gardiner B. Davis
Represented By: J. Loyd Gattis, III
Represented By: Stephen J Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?