Cooper v. Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Cooper
Defendant: Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01293
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Sarah W. Hays
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 111 motion. Signed on 7/18/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION. Signed on 12/5/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 motion to conditionally certify collective action. Plaintiff's collective is conditionally certified, and Plaintiff is directed to file a revised proposed notice within 14 days of this order. Signed on 5/1/2017 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Law Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Tina G. Fowler
Represented By: Katherine A O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Cooper
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Scott Brady
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?