Enslein v. Di Mase et al
Plaintiff: Jerald S Enslein
Defendant: Giacomo E Di Mase, Leonard P. Kaiser, Tristam G Jensvold, Steve McKeon, Lee O. Kraus, Jose Di Mase, DuraSeal Pipe Coatings Company LLC, DuraSeal Holdings S.r.L., Joseph Johnston, Dietmar Rose and Robert Olson
Interested_party: US Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 4:2016cv09020
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER VACATING CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 12/5/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to all pro se participants without PACER accounts.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT JENSVOLD (Doc. #509), DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHNSTON (Doc. #537), AND CLARIFYING THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 ORDER (Doc. #516). Signed on 11/1/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Chambers will mail a copy of this order to all parties without Pacer accounts and will also email a copy of the order to Defendant Johnston.) Kitsmiller, Julia)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER AND OPINION ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINSTDEFENDANTS DURASEAL PIPE COATINGS COMPANY LLC ANDDURASEAL HOLDINGS, S.R.L. AS TO LIABILITY ON COUNTS I, II, AND III. Signed on 9/16/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Richard, Tracey) (A copy of this order was mailed to all pro se parties.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Doc. 450 Signed on 9/11/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to all parties not participating in ECF.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER AND OPINION ON THE PARTIES' DAUBERT MOTIONS AND THE PARTIES' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. In addition, fourteen days after this Order is entered, the Clerk of the Court shall unseal all summary judgment motion briefs, Daubert motion briefs, and exhibits attached to all briefs unless otherwise directed by the Court. If a party seeks to maintain a document's sealed status, the party must seek said relief from the Court as set forth above. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 6/17/2019 edit docket text only.(Matthes Mitra, Renea). (Copy mailed to Tristam Jensvold at address on docket sheet) (Houston, Kiambu).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST ADAMS AND BEAUBEIN, INC. AS SANCTIONS FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA AND THE COURT'S ORDERS. Signed on 10/15/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (A copy of this order was sent by regular and certified mail, article No. 9590 9402 3042 7124 3238 98, to Richard Beaubien, 4770 N. Belleview Avenue, #101, Gladstone, MO 64116 and to John Adams, 4770 N. Belleview Avenue, #101, Gladstone, MO 64116, article No. 9590 9402 3042 7124 3233 93, on 10/15/2018.) (Melvin, Greg)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER AND OPINION DENYING DEFENDANT DURASEAL PIPE COATINGS COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY POLSINELLI PC, 142 . Signed on 3/22/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to the pro se Defendants.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 20 Defendant Lee Kraus's Motion to Dismiss and denying 25 Defendant Dietmar Rose's motion to dismiss. Signed on 7/21/2017 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enslein v. Di Mase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald S Enslein
Represented By: Todd Henry Bartels
Represented By: Robert V Spake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacomo E Di Mase
Represented By: John R. Weist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard P. Kaiser
Represented By: Karl Kuckelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristam G Jensvold
Represented By: Sean Thomas McGrevey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee O. Kraus
Represented By: Lisa A Epps
Represented By: Barry L Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Di Mase
Represented By: Barry L Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuraSeal Pipe Coatings Company LLC
Represented By: Lisa A Epps
Represented By: Barry L Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuraSeal Holdings S.r.L.
Represented By: Barry L Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Johnston
Represented By: David S. Ladwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dietmar Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Olson
Represented By: Desarae G. Harrah
Represented By: Jeffrey R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: US Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?