Luna et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lourdes Diana Luna and Guillermo Luna
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Corporation, Millsap & Singer, P.C., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00473
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #84 MOTION for summary judgment Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 6/4/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #84 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #84 ) (Scott, Charles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Hilary H. Sommer on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Memorandum in Support)(Sommer, Hilary)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 motion to amend/correct. Dispositive motion deadline extended to 5/15/19. Signed on 4/10/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to amend/correct 80 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Hilary H. Sommer on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 80 ) (Sommer, Hilary)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #47 motion for summary judgment. Signed on 3/27/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 motion for extension of time.Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2019. Signed on 2/28/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for extension of time filed by Hilary H. Sommer on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sommer, Hilary)
February 21, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of appearance by Hilary H. Sommer on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Attorney Hilary H. Sommer added to party U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(Sommer, Hilary)
December 28, 2018 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.(Nicol, Jonathon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #47 MOTION for summary judgment Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 1/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miles, Christopher) Modified on 12/20/2018 to reflect as reply suggestion (Houston, Kiambu).
December 18, 2018 Filing 75 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna. Reply suggestions due by 1/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scott, Charles) Modified by the Clerk's Office on 12/19/2018 to reflect as suggestion in opposition (Houston, Kiambu).
December 11, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Appear and Produce Documents by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miles, Christopher)
December 10, 2018 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.(Nicol, Jonathon)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Discovery due by 2/1/2019. Dispositive motions due 3/1/19. Signed on 12/7/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 6, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery and Dispositive Motion deadlines filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miles, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Second motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #47 MOTION for summary judgment Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 12/4/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 69 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Scott, Charles)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust answer due 12/10/2018.; denying #56 motion for default judgment; denying #57 motion for reconsideration. Signed on 12/3/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #47 MOTION for summary judgment Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 11/16/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 66 First MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Scott, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to respond to Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment #47 .Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2018. Signed on 11/15/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 motion for appointment of translator. Signed on 11/15/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 9, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for order Appointment of Translator re #62 Notice to Take Deposition, #61 Notice to Take Deposition filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #62 , #61 ) (Miles, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE to take deposition of Lourdes Diana Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE to take deposition of Guillermo Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 60 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Gary A. Fenner: Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2018. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Charles S. Scott, Jr.. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Christopher C Miles. Time in court: 1:15 pm to 1:20 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Kathy Calvert, 816-512-5741. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference to be initiated by defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's counsel set for 11/6/2018 01:15 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 4, 2018 Filing 58 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #53 MOTION for extension of time to file answer , move against, or otherwise respond to Complaint filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna. Reply suggestions due by 11/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Scott, Charles)
November 4, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for reconsideration re #51 Order on Motion for Default Judgment filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Scott, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 56 First MOTION for default judgment to Clerk of the Court filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scott, Charles)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER finding as moot #18 motion to dismiss party Substitute Trustee Corporation. Defendant dismissed by stipulation on 11/1/18. Signed on 11/1/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order of Dismissal of defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation only per Stipulation of Dismissal #40 . Signed on 11/1/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for extension of time to file answer , move against, or otherwise respond to Complaint filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nicol, Jonathon)
October 31, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of appearance by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Attorney Jonathon D Nicol added to party U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(Nicol, Jonathon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #50 motion for default judgment. Signed on 10/31/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 26, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for default judgment against U.S. Bank, N.A. filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scott, Charles)
October 24, 2018 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC re #48 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Related document: #48 Suggestions in Support of Motion filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Filing 48 SUGGESTIONS in support re #47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Miles, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miles, Christopher)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing plaintiffs to file status report on or before 11/2/18. Status Report due by 11/2/2018. Signed on 10/23/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 22, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Scott, Charles)
October 22, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to order re #41 Order filed by Charles S Pullium, III on behalf of Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C.. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Pullium, Charles)
October 21, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Guillermo Luna. (Scott, Charles)
October 17, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE to order re #41 Order filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Miles, Christopher)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER directing the parties to respond re #40 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Substitute Trustee Corporation. Responses due by 10/22/2018. Signed on 10/17/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 16, 2018 Filing 40 STIPULATION of dismissal by Substitute Trustee Corporation. (Cira, Casey)
October 16, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of appearance by Wesley Thurmond Kozeny on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation (Attorney Wesley Thurmond Kozeny added to party Substitute Trustee Corporation(pty:dft))(Kozeny, Wesley)
October 11, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Answers to Defendant Ocwen Interrogatories and Responses to Ocwen Requests for Production Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna.(Scott, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 motion for extension of time to respond to Ocwen Loan LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs. Response due 10/10/18. Signed on 10/1/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE to motion re #35 MOTION for extension of time to respond to Ocwen First Interrogatories and Request for Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 10/15/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miles, Christopher)
September 29, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for extension of time to respond to Ocwen First Interrogatories and Request for Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/15/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Scott, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Lourdes Luna Responses to Def Ocwen Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff Lourdes Luna filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna.(Scott, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs G Luna Responses to Def Ocwen Request for Admission to G Luna filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna.(Scott, Charles)
September 27, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #18 MOTION to dismiss party Substitute Trustee Corporation filed by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Default)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Cira, Casey)
September 20, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna.(Scott, Charles)
September 20, 2018 Filing 30 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #18 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Luna, Lourdes Diana Luna. Reply suggestions due by 10/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Scott, Charles)
September 10, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation.(Cira, Casey)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion for extension of time(Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Suggestions in opposition due 9/20/18. Signed on 9/4/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 3, 2018 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for extension of time , Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #18 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Charles S. Scott, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Scott, Charles)
August 29, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Lourdes Diana Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Guillermo Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC First Requests for Admissions Directed to Plaintiff Guillermo Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Requests for Production to Plaintiff Guillermo Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Lourdes Diana Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Request for Admissions Directed to Plaintiff Lourdes Diana Luna filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Cira, Casey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B)(Cira, Casey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation.(Cira, Casey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Casey C. Cira on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation (Attorney Casey C. Cira added to party Substitute Trustee Corporation(pty:dft))(Cira, Casey)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/15/2018. Pretrial Conference via telephone to be initiated by plaintiffs' counsel set for 7/11/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Bench Trial set for 8/12/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 1/4/2019. Signed on 8/10/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 8/10/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Millsap & Singer, P.C., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Miles, Christopher)
August 9, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Substitute Trustee Corporation. (Woods, Gloria)
July 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Millsap & Singer, P.C..(Pullium, Charles)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading. Due 7/26/18. Signed on 7/5/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Mitchell, Lisa)
July 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time filed by Charles S Pullium, III on behalf of Millsap & Singer, P.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Pullium, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Charles S Pullium, III on behalf of Defendant Millsap & Singer, P.C..(Pullium, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Consent to Removal by Millsap & Singer, P.C. (Pullium, Charles)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Charles S Pullium, III on behalf of Millsap & Singer, P.C. (Attorney Charles S Pullium, III added to party Millsap & Singer, P.C.(pty:dft))(Pullium, Charles)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/9/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 7/30/2018. Signed on 6/25/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Answer to Complaint, #2 Disclosure of corporate interests filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, #2 Disclosure of corporate interests filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLCs ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher C Miles on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Miles, Christopher)
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1816-CV05854, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5820652. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Miles, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Diana Luna
Represented By: Charles S. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Luna
Represented By: Charles S. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Corporation
Represented By: Wesley Thurmond Kozeny
Represented By: Casey C. Cira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millsap & Singer, P.C.
Represented By: Charles S Pullium, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Jonathon D Nicol
Represented By: Hilary H. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher C Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?