Vincent v. Kansas City Reentry Center et al
Plaintiff: Darrell L. Vincent
Defendant: Melanie Nash, Anita Petifard, Christopher Browning, Spencer Colliatie, Department of Corrections, Kansas City Reentry Center, Stephanie Wilson and C. Lollor
Case Number: 4:2018cv00631
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous Order. (Davies, Cindy)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous Order. Signed on October 9, 2018 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Davies, Cindy)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the Clerk of the Court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, the filing fee of $350; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (3) Plaintiff is directed to file a single amended complaint, as specifically discussed above; and (4) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required filing fee and amend the complaint as directed, on or before September 25, 2018, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on September 11, 2018 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT as directed by 8/15/18 order (Doc. #3 ) filed by Darrell L. Vincent. (Davies, Cindy)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Darrell L. Vincent. (Richard, Tracey)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: ORDERED that (1) plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a); (2) plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in this complaint on or before August 29, 2018; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order along with an in forma paupers form; and (4) FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Signed on August 15, 2018 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Darrell L. Vincent. (Richard, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. Kansas City Reentry Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Petifard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Colliatie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Reentry Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lollor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell L. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?