Bowers v. Horwitz et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Kram Holdings, LLC. and Jacob B. Horwitz
Case Number: 4:2018cv00717
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of settlement by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER:(1) Defendant KRAM Holdings, LLC's #10 motion to set aside the default is GRANTED;(2) The Clerk's #8 Entry of Default is SET ASIDE;(3) Plaintiff's #9 motion for default judgment is DENIED; and(4) Defendant KRAM Holdings, LLC's Answer is due November 8, 2018.Signed on 10/29/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant KRAM Holdings, LLC filed by Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II on behalf of Defendant Kram Holdings, LLC.. Reply suggestions due by 11/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Riesmeyer, Frederick)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to set aside default and for Leave to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II on behalf of Kram Holdings, LLC.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II added to party Kram Holdings, LLC.(pty:dft))(Riesmeyer, Frederick)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/12/2018 as Document No. 9, Motion for Default Judgment. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word or WordPerfect format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant KRAM Holdings, LLC filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration ISO Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Entry of Default Judgment)(Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Kram Holdings, LLC. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for default judgment filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration ISO Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proposed Entry of Default)(Voytas, Richard)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service unexecuted by Eric Bowers as to Jacob B. Horwitz. (Voytas, Richard)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Kram Holdings, LLC. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob B. Horwitz, Kram Holdings, LLC.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ***Remark Copies mailed 9/12/2018 to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Woods, Gloria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacob B. Horwitz, Kram Holdings, LLC. filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5935607. Service due by 12/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Horwitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kram Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob B. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?