Horgan v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: James Horgan
Defendant: Trey Hunt, USPS and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00721
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Horgan. Trey Hunt served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Roby, Eric) Modified on 10/17/2018: An incorrect date of service was entered. Service date and answer date corrected. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Horgan. (Roby, Eric)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Horgan. United States of America served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Roby, Eric)
September 24, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Melvin, Greg)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 9/13/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eric D. Roby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5935859. Service due by 12/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Roby, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horgan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Horgan
Represented By: Eric D. Roby
Represented By: William L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?