Roberts v. Teamsters Local 955 et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Roberts
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Teamsters Local 955
Case Number: 4:2018cv00745
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. #5 , is granted. However, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Defendant's motion to dismiss, Doc. #3 , is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Seventh Judicial Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 14, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts.(Kapke, George)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 10/15/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/2/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/16/2018. Signed on 10/2/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Roberts. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit of Clay County County, case number 18CY-CV08224, filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5945659. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: CBA, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Docket)(Amash, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Teamsters Local 955 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Roberts
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?