Brandon's Bread, LLC et al v. BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Feagles and Brandon's Bread, LLC
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Teamsters Local 955, BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2018cv00747
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiffs' motion to remand, Doc. #8 , is granted. However, Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. The Union's motion to dismiss, Doc. #6 , is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit Court of Cass County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 14, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 9, 2018 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George)
November 2, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Sanocki, Kristen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC and Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time, Doc. #29 , is granted. Said Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss or stay proceedings pending arbitration, Doc. #17 , is withdrawn without prejudice. Defendants Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC and Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.'s response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due within twenty-one days following the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' motion to remand, Doc. #8 . No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed on 10/26/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for extension of time TO ANSWER WITH CONSENT AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Poplstein, Charles)
October 23, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles.(Kapke, George)
October 19, 2018 Filing 27 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2018: Main document replaced. Per Administrative Procedures, proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC.(Lamping, Brian)
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION to remand filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles.(Kapke, George)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Poplstein, Charles)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/19/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/15/2018. Signed on 10/5/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 10/5/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Brian C. Wimes no longer assigned to case.Please note the new case number is 4:18-cv-00747-NKL. Signed on 10/5/2018 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Travis, Kendra)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to L.R. 83.9(c), this matter is transferred to Judge Laughrey for all further proceedings. Signed on 10/5/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IT IS ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #10) is, with Plaintiffs having no objection, GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before October 5, 2018. In the future, motions of this type shall be filed at least 3 days before the deadline dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed on 10/5/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) Modified on 10/4/2018 to reflect "Amended" Notice. (Woods, Gloria).
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lamping, Brian)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Brandon's Bread, LLC, Brandon Feagles. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Lamping, Brian)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Charles M. Poplstein added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Poplstein added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Poplstein, Charles)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/19/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/20/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Brian T. Fenimore. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventeenth Judicial Court County, case number 18CA-CC00278, filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5945732. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: CBA, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Docket)(Amash, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon's Bread, LLC et al v. BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Feagles
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon's Bread, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?