Guenther v. BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brian Guenther
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Craig Haussmann, Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Teamsters Local 955 and BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00748
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 32 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. #10 , is granted. However, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Defendants' motions to dismiss, Docs. #8 and #13 , are denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Sixteenth Judicial Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 14, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 9, 2018 Filing 30 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George)
November 2, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann (Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Craig Haussmann(pty:dft))(Sanocki, Kristen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Guenther.(Kapke, George)
October 19, 2018 Filing 25 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brian Guenther. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2018: Main document replaced. Per Administrative Procedures, proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Guenther. Reply suggestions due by 10/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Guenther. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC.(Lamping, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann. Reply suggestions due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Guenther. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/19/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/16/2019. Signed on 10/9/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 10/9/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please make note of the new case number 18-00748-CV-W-NKL. Signed on 10/9/18 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Poplstein, Charles)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Guenther. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 9/28/2018: Main Document 10 replaced at request of filing counsel. NEF regenerated.) (Melvin, Greg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 A - CBA)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Utility - Answer due dates; Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. 10/5/2018; Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC 10/5/2018; Craig Haussmann 10/5/2018. (Anderson, Christy)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendants BIMBO Bakeries USA, Inc, BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC and Craig Haussmann answers due on or before 10/5/18. Signed on 9/25/18 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann (Attorney Charles M. Poplstein added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Poplstein added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Poplstein added to party Craig Haussmann(pty:dft))(Poplstein, Charles)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply Responsive Pleadings filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Craig Haussmann. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lamping, Brian)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Lamping, Brian)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 9/19/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixteenth Judicial Court County, case number 1816-CV21121, filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5945757. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: CBA, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Docket)(Amash, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Haussmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Guenther
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?