Ayers v. Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Audra Ayers
Defendant: Sherry McNary, Dan Brewster and Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00749
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Audra Ayers. (Geary, Grant)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Mark P Grajski and Geoffrey Westbrook for Dan Brewster, Sherry McNary, and Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. ; This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to allow Geoffrey C. Westbrook to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5997283) filed by Francis X. Neuner, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Neuner, Francis)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to allow Mark P. Grajski to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5997243) filed by Francis X. Neuner, Jr on behalf of Dan Brewster, Sherry McNary, Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC. (Neuner, Francis)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/2/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/16/2018. Signed on 10/2/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Sherry McNary's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Sherry McNary.(Peterson, Brian)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Dan Brewster's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Dan Brewster.(Peterson, Brian)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Prime Healthcare Service's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC.(Peterson, Brian)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Francis X. Neuner, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Francis X. Neuner, Jr added to party Dan Brewster(pty:dft), Attorney Francis X. Neuner, Jr added to party Sherry McNary(pty:dft), Attorney Francis X. Neuner, Jr added to party Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC(pty:dft))(Neuner, Francis)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1816-CV18322, filed by Brian E Peterson on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5946916. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit PHS Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Brewster Return of Service, #4 Exhibit McNary Return of Service, #5 Exhibit Brewster Declaration, #6 Exhibit McNary Declaration, #7 Exhibit State Court File, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry McNary
Represented By: Brian E Peterson
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P Grajski
Represented By: Geoffrey C Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Brewster
Represented By: Brian E Peterson
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P Grajski
Represented By: Geoffrey C Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Healthcare Services Kansas City, LLC
Represented By: Brian E Peterson
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P Grajski
Represented By: Geoffrey C Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Ayers
Represented By: Grant Woodson Geary
Represented By: Kathleen E Mannion
Represented By: Wade A Schilling
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?