United States of America v. United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: United States Currency
Case Number: 4:2018cv00765
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to United States Currency. United States Currency served on 10/4/2018. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Perkins Rock, Stacey)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Brooke Garretson by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 9/25/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against $14,240.00 in United States Currency filed by Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 12/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blackburn, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?