Roa v. Swope Community Builders MI, LP et al
Plaintiff: Marbis D. R. Roa
Defendant: East Village Apts., Fulson Asset Management Company, LLC and Swope Community Builders MI, LP
Case Number: 4:2018cv00833
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Suggestions filed by Christopher Barhorst on behalf of Defendants East Village Apts., Fulson Asset Management Company, LLC, Swope Community Builders MI, LP. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Barhorst, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as unclaimed. Mail sent to Marbis D.R Roa. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Travis, Kendra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Suggestions on behalf of Plaintiff Marbis D. R. Roa. Reply suggestions due by 12/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Travis, Kendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 GREEN CARD showing return of service re #6 Order,. Marbis D.R. Roa served on 11/8/2018. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Travis, Kendra)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Supporting Suggestions filed by Christopher Barhorst on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barhorst, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying plaintiff's "emergency request" for an injunction or motion for temporary restraining order. Signed on 11/6/18 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7012 3460 0001 7395 7388) to Marbis D. R. Roa at 950 Holmes St. Apt. 201, Kansas City, MO 64106. (Anderson, Christy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 GREEN CARD showing return of service re #3 Order,,. served on 10/26/18 (Related document(s) #3 ) (Woods, Gloria)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to order re #3 Order,, Defendants' Objection to and Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Request for an Order of Injunction filed by Christopher Barhorst on behalf of Defendants East Village Apts., Fulson Asset Management Company, LLC, Swope Community Builders MI, LP. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Barhorst, Christopher)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff and Defendant's counsel are directed to informally contact chambers to schedule a conference in reference to plaintiff's emergency request for an injunction and request for a temporary restraining order. Signed on 10/24/18 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7012 3460 0001 7395 7326) to Marbis D. R. Roa at 950 Holmes St. Apt. 201, Kansas City, MO 64106 and Christopher Barhorst (Rct No. 7012 3460 0001 7395 7333) at 117 W. 20 Street, Suite 102Kansas City, MO 64108. (Anderson, Christy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP) mailed via USPS to pro-se Plaintiff on 10/23/18. REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Marbis D. R. Roa. Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO073633. Service due by 1/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roa v. Swope Community Builders MI, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marbis D. R. Roa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Village Apts.
Represented By: Brian Michael Griggs
Represented By: Christopher Barhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulson Asset Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian Michael Griggs
Represented By: Christopher Barhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swope Community Builders MI, LP
Represented By: Brian Michael Griggs
Represented By: Christopher Barhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?