Sorge v. FCA US LLC et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Sorge
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc., FCA US LLC and Jayme N. Ambrose
Case Number: 4:2018cv00871
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #18 MOTION to remand filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Sorge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Emison, Mark)
December 26, 2018 Filing 30 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by FCA US LLC. (Beashore, Chad)
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming William H. Sanders, Jr.(Emison, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) on behalf of FCA US LLC.(Beashore, Chad)
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 Defendant Jayme Ambrose's ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint on behalf of Jayme N. Ambrose.(Wolf, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc..(Suroff, Adam)
December 17, 2018 Filing 25 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC. (Beashore, Chad)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #18 MOTION to remand filed by William Clark Richardson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/28/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Richardson, William)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ian K Edwards for FCA US LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 Motion to allow Ian K. Edwards to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6072738) filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Beashore, Chad)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Robert L. Langdon on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Langdon, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 motion to file amended complaint. With the filing of the amended complaint, the #8 motion to dismiss party and the #13 motion to strike are moot. Signed on 12/3/18 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION to remand filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Sorge. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Emison, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to remand filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Matthew Sorge. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Emison, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Matthew Sorge.(Emison, Mark)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint as a Matter of Course Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1)(B) filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Matthew Sorge. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Emison, Mark)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Amended RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/26/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 12/10/2018. Signed on 11/26/18 by District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 23, 2018 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew Sorge. Reply suggestions due by 12/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Emison, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to strike Paragraphs 42, 55, 70 and 85 of Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Dimiss All Punitive Damages Allegations filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Matthew Sorge. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Emison, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Beth Phillips. (Melvin, Greg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Adam Tod Suroff on behalf of Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc..(Suroff, Adam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Suroff, Adam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc..(Attorney Adam Tod Suroff added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft))(Suroff, Adam)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Beashore, Chad)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Robert L. Langdon on behalf of Matthew Sorge (Langdon, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Mark Emison on behalf of Matthew Sorge (Emison, Mark)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/26/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 12/10/2018. Signed on November 2, 2018 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to attorneys for the following parties: FCA US LLC, Jayme N. Ambrose and Matthew Sorge. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC filed by William Clark Richardson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC.(Attorney William Clark Richardson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Richardson, William) Modified on 11/2/2018 main document 3 replaced to correct filing oversight. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Travis, Kendra)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC.(Beashore, Chad)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1816-cv20409, filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6017548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10)(Beashore, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorge v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sorge
Represented By: Mark Emison
Represented By: Robert L. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Adam Tod Suroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Beashore
Represented By: Ian K Edwards
Represented By: William Clark Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme N. Ambrose
Represented By: Katherine Asfour
Represented By: Timothy J Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?