Nelsen v. SPLC Southern Poverty Law Center et al
Plaintiff: Craig Nelson and Craig Nelsen
Defendant: Stephen Piggot, Dees Morris, Heidi Beirich, SPLC Southern Poverty Law Center, Richard Cohen, Southern Poverty Law Center, Bill Sellars and Morris Dees
Case Number: 4:2018cv00895
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 PRO SE MOTION to join filed by Craig Nelsen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crocker, Susan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #2 Exhibit Davis IFP, #3 Exhibit Davis Financial Affidavit) (Crocker, Susan).
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, Stephen Piggot, Bill Sellars, Southern Poverty Law Center Craig Nelsen.(Crocker, Susan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 PRO SE MOTION to join Sellers as defendant filed by Craig Nelsen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Crocker, Susan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 & #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Chad R Bowman and Christopher M Proczko for Southern Poverty Law Center, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, and Heidi Beirich, allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) Modified on 12/20/2018 to show copy mailed to Craig Nelsen 905 McGee Street Kansas City, MO 64106 (Geiser, Angel).
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by USM on behalf of Craig Nelsen. Heidi Beirich served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by USM on behalf of Craig Nelsen. Morris Dees served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by USM on behalf of Craig Nelsen. Richard Cohen served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service unexecuted by USM on behalf of Craig Nelsen as to Stephen Piggot. USM-285 form reads: "No longer employed by SPLC." (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by USM on behalf of Craig Nelsen. Southern Poverty Law Center served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Melvin, Greg)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion of Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Southern Poverty Law Center, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, and Heidi Beirich shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 26, 2019. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Craig Nelson via regular mail. Signed on 12/20/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to allow Christopher M. Proczko to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6087323) filed by Jean A. Maneke on behalf of Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, Southern Poverty Law Center. (Maneke, Jean)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Motion to allow Chad R. Bowman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6087192) filed by Jean A. Maneke on behalf of Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, Southern Poverty Law Center. (Maneke, Jean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Jean A. Maneke on behalf of Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees (Attorney Jean A. Maneke added to party Heidi Beirich(pty:dft), Attorney Jean A. Maneke added to party Richard Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Jean A. Maneke added to party Morris Dees(pty:dft))(Maneke, Jean)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of counsel Regarding F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 by Jean A. Maneke on behalf of Southern Poverty Law Center (Maneke, Jean)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jean A. Maneke on behalf of Southern Poverty Law Center. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Mot Ext Time)(Attorney Jean A. Maneke added to party Southern Poverty Law Center(pty:dft))(Maneke, Jean)
November 29, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. USM 285, summons, order, and amended complaint delivered to USM for service. (Crocker, Susan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, Stephen Piggot, Southern Poverty Law Center by Craig Nelson.(Crocker, Susan)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 11/15/2018.(Woods, Gloria)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Heidi Beirich, Richard Cohen, Morris Dees, Stephen Piggot, Southern Poverty Law Center Craig Nelson. Service due by 2/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crocker, Susan)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed on 11/14/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 11/14/2018 (Moore, Terri).
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Craig Nelson. (Woods, Gloria)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Craig Nelson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelsen v. SPLC Southern Poverty Law Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Piggot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dees Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Beirich
Represented By: Chad R Bowman
Represented By: Christopher M Proczko
Represented By: Jean A. Maneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPLC Southern Poverty Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cohen
Represented By: Chad R Bowman
Represented By: Christopher M Proczko
Represented By: Jean A. Maneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Chad R Bowman
Represented By: Christopher M Proczko
Represented By: Jean A. Maneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sellars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Dees
Represented By: Chad R Bowman
Represented By: Christopher M Proczko
Represented By: Jean A. Maneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?