Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Morgan's Flooring, LLC
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce, James W Carson, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Albert L Bond, Renee Bell, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council and Donald E Greenwell, III
Defendant: Morgan's Flooring, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00905
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why default judgment should not be entered.Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2019. Signed on 1/9/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (A copy of this order was sent by regular and certified mail, article No. 7006 2760 0000 6393 8335, to Morgan's Flooring, LLC, 906 South St. Louis Street, Concordia, MO 64020 on 1/9/2019.) (Melvin, Greg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Morgan's Flooring, LLC. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for default judgment by Clerk filed by John Joseph Westerhaus on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westerhaus, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION for default judgment filed by John Joseph Westerhaus on behalf of Plaintiffs Renee Bell, Albert L Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James W Carson, Donald E Greenwell, III, Dennis Joyce, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Westerhaus, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for default judgment filed by John Joseph Westerhaus on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Westerhaus, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Westerhaus, John)
December 5, 2018 Set answer deadline: Defendant's Answer due 12/26/2018. (Moore, Terri)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lorie Beasley, Registered Agent for Morgan's Flooring, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Joseph Westerhaus on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6034734. Service due by 2/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Westerhaus, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Morgan's Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Carson
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert L Bond
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Bell
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By: John Joseph Westerhaus
Represented By: Michael G. Newbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan's Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?