Northcon, Inc. et al v. Alpha Energy and Electric Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Northcon, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company and Alpha Energy and Electric Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00994
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/11/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 2/23/2019. Signed on 1/22/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Alpha Energy and Electric Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company.(Attorney Paul K. Hentzen added to party Alpha Energy and Electric Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul K. Hentzen added to party American Contractors Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(Hentzen, Paul)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Northcon, Inc.. American Contractors Indemnity Company served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (McDonnell, Benjamin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of MAPN, #6 Return of Service of Complaint Executed by Northcon, Inc.. (Related document(s)[], #1 , #2 , #6 ) (McDonnell, Benjamin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Benjamin J McDonnell on behalf of Plaintiff Northcon, Inc..(McDonnell, Benjamin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Northcon, Inc.. Alpha Energy and Electric Inc. served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Croker, Paul)
December 28, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alpha Energy and Electric Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Woods, Gloria)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 & #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Benjamin J McDonnell and Ryan D Yahne for Northcon, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to allow Ryan D. Yahne to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6087101) filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Northcon, Inc.. (Croker, Paul)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to allow Benjamin J. McDonnell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6087079) filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Northcon, Inc.. (Croker, Paul)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Travis, Kendra) Modified on 12/21/2018 main document 2 replaced to correct document. NEF regenerated to all parties.(Travis, Kendra)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpha Energy and Electric Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Northcon, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6086606. Service due by 3/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Croker, Paul) (Additional attachment added on 12/20/2018: #2 Exhibit) Modified on 12/20/2018: Exhibit added at request of filing counsel. (Melvin, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northcon, Inc. et al v. Alpha Energy and Electric Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: Paul K. Hentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Energy and Electric Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Hentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northcon, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Croker
Represented By: Ryan D Yahne
Represented By: Benjamin J McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?