Ragan v. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald V Ragan, Jr. and Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. and Van Tuyl Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01010
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. answer due 3/14/2019; Van Tuyl Companies, Inc. answer due 3/14/2019. Signed on 2/12/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Ryan J. Schletzbaum on behalf of Defendant Van Tuyl Companies, Inc..(Schletzbaum, Ryan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Ryan J. Schletzbaum on behalf of Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc..(Schletzbaum, Ryan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond filed by Ryan J. Schletzbaum on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc., Van Tuyl Companies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Schletzbaum, Ryan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan J. Schletzbaum on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc., Van Tuyl Companies, Inc. (Attorney Ryan J. Schletzbaum added to party Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan J. Schletzbaum added to party Van Tuyl Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schletzbaum, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ronald Ragan, Jr. Van Tuyl Companies, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Accurso, Louis)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ronald Ragan, Jr. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Accurso, Louis)
January 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 ***Remark AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy sent to Register of Copyrights via first class mail. (Woods, Gloria)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Ronald Ragan Jr. against Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc., Van Tuyl Companies, Inc. filed by Louis Carl Accurso on behalf of Ronald Ragan, Jr. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6094963. Service due by 3/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Accurso, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan v. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Schletzbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Tuyl Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. Schletzbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald V Ragan, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Carl Accurso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Carl Accurso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?