Creamer v. Kansas City Area Transportation Authority
Plaintiff: Marjorie A Creamer and The Hush
Defendant: Kansas City Area Transportation Authority and KCATA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00021
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kansas City Area Transportation Authority filed by Marjorie A Creamer.(Kern, Kendra)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff is granted leave to file a proposed amended complaint on or before February 4, 2019 containing factual allegations sufficient to meet the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Failure to file an amended proposed complaint by the stated deadline may result in dismissal of Plaintiffs case without further notice. Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #1) remains pending. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff as directed in order. Signed on 1/15/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Marjorie A Creamer. (Woods, Gloria)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marjorie A Creamer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creamer v. Kansas City Area Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie A Creamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Area Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?