Curne v. Harley-Davidson
Plaintiff: Jarrell Curne
Defendant: Harley-Davidson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00027
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION in limine filed by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Defendant Harley-Davidson. Reply suggestions due by 3/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Warren, Robert)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jarrell Curne. Harley-Davidson served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Houston, Kiambu)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION for order on behalf of Plaintiff Jarrell Curne. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Houston, Kiambu)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION in limine filed by Jarrell Curne. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION for order for Default filed by Robert K. Warren on behalf of Defendant Harley-Davidson. Reply suggestions due by 3/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Attorney Robert K. Warren added to party Harley-Davidson(pty:dft))(Warren, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION to the Clerk for Default filed by Jarrell Curne. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kern, Kendra)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jarrell Curne on behalf of Plaintiff Jarrell Curne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kern, Kendra)
January 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harley-Davidson. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 3/13/2019 to note correct date summons was issued. (Woods, Gloria).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). MAP Notice and General Order Provided to Pro-Se Plaintiff in office on 1/14/19. REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) Modified on 1/15/2019 to note pro-se plaintiff was provided details of MAP Assignment(Woods, Gloria).
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harley-Davidson Jarrell Curne. Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO075202. Service due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curne v. Harley-Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson
Represented By: Robert K. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrell Curne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?