Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez and Angela G. Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00050
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 ***Remark: The Court hereby acknowledges the parties Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. #27). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION of dismissal by United States of America. (Mokodean, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Angela G. Martinez.(Hood, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED Plaintiff's motion to file answer to Defendant's counterclaim out of time (Doc. #24), with Defendant having no objection, is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response within five days from the date of this Order. Signed on 6/21/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) to file Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of Angela G. Martinez. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer to Defendant Counterclaim)(Hood, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for United States' first set of document requests to Plaintiff filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Defendant United States of America, Counter Claimant United States of America.(Mokodean, Gregory)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for United States' first set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Defendant United States of America, Counter Claimant United States of America.(Mokodean, Gregory) (Main Document 22 replaced on 5/29/2019 at the request of counsel) (Houston, Kiambu).
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Defendant United States of America, Counter Claimant United States of America.(Mokodean, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of Plaintiff Angela G. Martinez.(Hood, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND BENCH TRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 6/12/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Participation numbers and access code are provided in the order. Two-day Bench Trial set for 7/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 5/28/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/28/2019; order to issue. Time in court: 9:36 a.m. to 9:44 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Angela G. Martinez on behalf of United States of America.(Mokodean, Gregory)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Honorable Charles E. Atwell(Hood, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED Defendant's Motion to Appear Telephonically (Doc. #14) is GRANTED. Defendant is granted leave to appear by telephone at the initial scheduling conference on May 28, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date. Signed on 5/13/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for leave to appear by telephone filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mokodean, Gregory)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against United States of America filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of Angela G. Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admin Wrongful Levy Claim and Memorandum, #2 Exhibit IRS Denial of Wrongful Levy Claim)(Hood, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Substitute Party and File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #5) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its proposed Second Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file responsive pleadings on or before May 22, 2019. It is further ORDERED Defendants Motion for Extension of Time and Suggestions in Support (Doc. #7) is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED Defendants United States Motion to Dismiss or Substitute Defendant (Doc. #9) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 5/8/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Angela G. Martinez. (Hood, Matthew)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to dismiss party or to substitute defendant filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Mokodean, Gregory)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss party or to substitute defendant filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mokodean, Gregory)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (Jones, Robin)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/7/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/30/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 4/15/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #3 Amended Complaint, filed by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Mokodean, Gregory)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Gregory Louis Mokodean on behalf of Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service (Attorney Gregory Louis Mokodean added to party Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft))(Mokodean, Gregory)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to substitute party and file Second Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Compliant Substituting United States as Proper Defendant, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hood, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service served on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Hood, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service. (Woods, Gloria)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Administrative Wrongful Levy Claim, #3 Exhibit B - Denial of Claim)(Hood, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service filed by Matthew Lonergan Hood on behalf of Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez. Filing fee $400, receipt number BMOWDC-6135123. Service due by 4/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Claim and Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B - IRS Denial of Claim)(Hood, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Timothy A. Garrison
Represented By: Gregory Louis Mokodean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Timothy A. Garrison
Represented By: Gregory Louis Mokodean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Yordano Ventura Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew Lonergan Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela G. Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Lonergan Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?