Hand v. ARB KC, LLC
Plaintiff: J. T. Hand
Defendant: ARB KC, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc. and Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDERED, consistent with the hearing discussion on April 8, 2019, the parties shall confer regarding an amended proposed scheduling order to be filed on or before April 15, 2019. The Court will issue a first-phase scheduling order thereafter. Signed on April 9, 2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/8/2019; order to issue. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): William Charles Kenney and Michael Ovca. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti and Jacqueline M Sexton. Time in court: 10:38 a.m. to 11:06 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 & #29 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Eve-Lynn J Rapp and Rafey S. Balabanian for J. T. Hand allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to allow Rafey Balabanian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256845) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of J. T. Hand. (Kenney, William)
April 4, 2019 Filing 28 Motion to allow Eve-Lynn Rapp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256840) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of J. T. Hand. (Kenney, William)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (Doc. #24) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint on or before April 29, 2019. Signed on 4/4/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoenas to Non-Parties by J. T. Hand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to SendSmart Software, Inc., #2 Exhibit Subpoena to IT Nachos, LLC, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Think Big Partners, LLC)(Ovca, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J. T. Hand Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Requests filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Plaintiff J. T. Hand.(Kenney, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Defendants' Consent Motion to Set Date for All Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party Entertainment Consulting International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party The Cordish Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #16) is, in light of the amended complaint (Doc. #22), DENIED AS MOOT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 3/27/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Entertainment Consulting International, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARB KC, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc., Entertainment Consulting International, LLC filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of J. T. Hand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Kenney, William)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by J. T. Hand. (Ovca, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Benjamin H Richman for J. T. Hand allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to allow Benjamin Richman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6215167) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of J. T. Hand. (Kenney, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Notice of Constitutional Challenge by ARB KC, LLC (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant ARB KC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant ARB KC, LLC. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant ARB KC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael Ovca for J. T. Hand allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Michael Ovca to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6206631) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of J. T. Hand. (Kenney, William)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 #11 #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti,Whitney M Smith,Glenn T Graham for ARB KC, LLC, allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. ; This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Glenn T. Graham to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196166) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Whitney M. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196139) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Lauri A. Mazzuchetti to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196105) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #7) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 8, 2019. Signed on 2/15/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/1/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/15/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time Defendant ARB KC, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant ARB KC, LLC.(Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Zachary Tyler Bowles, I on behalf of ARB KC, LLC (Bowles, Zachary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by W. James Foland on behalf of ARB KC, LLC (Foland, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 16th Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1816-CV19818, filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of ARB KC, LLC d/b/a Angels Rock Bar. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6175688. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Coversheet)(Sexton, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hand v. ARB KC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. T. Hand
Represented By: William Charles Kenney
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Michael Ovca
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARB KC, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Tyler Bowles, I
Represented By: W. James Foland
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Represented By: Glenn T Graham
Represented By: Whitney M Smith
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cordish Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?