Doohan v. CTB Investors, LLC
Plaintiff: Andy Doohan
Defendant: CTB Investors, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc. and Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 & #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Eve-Lynn J Rapp and Rafey S. Balabanian for Andy Doohan allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to allow Rafey Balabanian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256854) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Andy Doohan. (Kenney, William)
April 4, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to allow Eve-Lynn Rapp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256849) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Andy Doohan. (Kenney, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoenas to Non-Parties by Andy Doohan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to SendSmart Software, Inc., #2 Exhibit Subpoena to IT Nachos, LLC, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Think Big Partners, LLC)(Ovca, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Aristotle N. Rodopoulos on behalf of Andy Doohan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rodopoulos, Aristotle)
April 1, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andy Doohan Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Requests filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Plaintiff Andy Doohan.(Kenney, William)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before April 29, 2019. Signed on 4/1/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rosa, Patricia)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Defendants' Consent Motion to Set Date for All Defendants To File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party Entertainment Consulting International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party The Cordish Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Entertainment Consulting International, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CTB Investors, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc., Entertainment Consulting International, LLC filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Andy Doohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Kenney, William)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Benjamin H Richman for Andy Doohan allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to allow Benjamin Richman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6215178) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Andy Doohan. (Kenney, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Notice of Constitutional Challenge by CTB Investors, LLC re #16 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant CTB Investors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant CTB Investors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant CTB Investors, LLC. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant CTB Investors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael Ovca for Andy Doohan allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Michael Ovca to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6206640) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Andy Doohan. (Kenney, William)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Defendant CTB Investors, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant CTB Investors, LLC shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Class Action Petition on or before March 8, 2019. Signed on 3/6/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rosa, Patricia)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 #8 #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti, Whitney M Smith, & Glenn T Graham for CTB Investors, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 3/1/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Glenn T. Graham to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196436) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Whitney M. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196431) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Lauri A. Mazzuchetti to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196430) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time Defendant CTB Investors, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Zachary Tyler Bowles, I on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar (Attorney Zachary Tyler Bowles, I added to party CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar(pty:dft))(Bowles, Zachary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by W. James Foland on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar (Attorney W. James Foland added to party CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar(pty:dft))(Foland, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 16th Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1816-CV19883, filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of CTB Investors, LLC d/b/a PBR Big Sky Cowboy Bar. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6175944. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sexton, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doohan v. CTB Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTB Investors, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Represented By: W. James Foland
Represented By: Zachary Tyler Bowles, I
Represented By: Glenn T Graham
Represented By: Whitney M Smith
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cordish Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Doohan
Represented By: William Charles Kenney
Represented By: Aristotle N. Rodopoulos
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Michael Ovca
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?