Bowers v. Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Christopher S Dawson and Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00118
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED Defendants' Motion #10 to Extend Deadlines is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to the deadline for the Rule 26(f) conference. The parties shall meet and confer about a proposed litigation schedule by May 13, 2019. The motion is denied in part with respect to the deadline to submit the proposed scheduling order. The parties shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order by May 17, 2019. Signed on 4/12/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Disclosure of Corporate Interests by Christopher S Dawson, Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC (Dawson, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Christopher Warren Dawson on behalf of Christopher S Dawson, Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dawson, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #7) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 24, 2019. Signed on 3/27/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/11/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 3/26/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Christopher Warren Dawson on behalf of Christopher S Dawson, Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dawson, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher Warren Dawson on behalf of Christopher S Dawson, Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC (Attorney Christopher Warren Dawson added to party Christopher S Dawson(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Warren Dawson added to party Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Dawson, Christopher)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ross, Nathan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Christopher S Dawson served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ross, Nathan)
February 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher S Dawson, Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Woods, Gloria)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nathan Ross on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6177401. Service due by 5/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S Dawson
Represented By: Christopher Warren Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orenda Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Warren Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Represented By: Ethan William Gee
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?