Bowers v. Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Derek McGrath and Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00144
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) Modified on 4/22/2019 to reflect copy of NEF mailed to Derek McGrath at address on docket sheet (Jones, Robin).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 4/17/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn) Modified on 4/17/2019 to reflect copy of Rule 16 Notice has been mailed to: Derek McGrath; 2300 Main Street 9th Floor; Kansas City, MO 64108 (Ellis, Lindsey).
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Derek McGrath, Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC.(Ellis, Lindsey)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Derek McGrath served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
February 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Derek McGrath, Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Nathan Ross on behalf of Eric Bowers (Attorney Nathan Ross added to party Eric Bowers(pty:pla))(Ross, Nathan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark*** Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Woods, Gloria)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Derek McGrath, Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6191460. Service due by 5/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Payton & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?