Salerno v. MPI Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Rosemary A Salerno
Defendant: Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC and MPI Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00145
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Rosemary A Salerno. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickson, Athena)
April 22, 2019 Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (Jones, Robin)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Teleconference set for 5/22/2020, 1:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 01:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 4/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service by MPI Management, LLC (Lillard, Samuel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno to Defendant Zona Rosa Town Center LLC filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno Defendant MPI Management LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Dickson, Athena)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Samuel N Lillard for MPI Management, LLC,Samuel N Lillard for Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Samuel N. Lillard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6197562) filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bustamante, Jessie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER.RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/1/2019. Signed on 2/28/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of Defendants MPI Management, LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV02990, filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC, MPI Management, LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6192757. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 -- MPI Management, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Zona Rosa)(Bustamante, Jessie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salerno v. MPI Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary A Salerno
Represented By: Eric W Smith
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McEnaney
Represented By: Rik N. Siro
Represented By: Raymond Dake
Represented By: Athena M. Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC
Represented By: Jessie F Bustamante
Represented By: Samuel N Lillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPI Management, LLC
Represented By: Jessie F Bustamante
Represented By: Samuel N Lillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?