Hudson v. Burlington Mattress Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Shelby Hudson
Defendant: Burlington Mattress Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00155
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /Discovery Plan by Burlington Mattress Company, LLC. (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 4/22/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/6/2019. Signed on 3/21/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by LaToi D Mayo on behalf of Defendant Burlington Mattress Company, LLC.(Mayo, LaToi)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Burlington Mattress Company, LLC.(Mayo, LaToi)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney LaToi D Mayo for Burlington Mattress Company, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow LaToi D. Mayo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6199858) filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Burlington Mattress Company, LLC. (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV02524, Burlington Mattress Company, LLC, d/b/a BMC Mattress. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6199591. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gonnerman, Alyssa) Modified on 3/1/2019 to identify Exhibit A. (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Burlington Mattress Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Hudson
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Represented By: Grant Woodson Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Mattress Company, LLC
Represented By: Alyssa Gonnerman
Represented By: LaToi D Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?