Newsom v. Ervin Cable Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hans Newsom
Defendant: Google Fiber Missouri, LLC and Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Ervin Cable Construction, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Utilisouth, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00169
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #19 MOTION to remand filed by Ryan J. Shernaman on behalf of Plaintiff Hans Newsom. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Shernaman, Ryan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 9/10/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Parties will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail at a later date. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 4/24/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2019; order to issue. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Time in court: 9:24 a.m. to 9:35 a.m.To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 23, 2019 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #19 MOTION to remand /Supplemental Suggestions in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendants Ervin Cable Construction, LLC, Google Fiber Missouri, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 5/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Meltzer, Hal)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 19, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendant Google Fiber Missouri, LLC.(Meltzer, Hal)
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendant Ervin Cable Construction, LLC.(Meltzer, Hal)
April 19, 2019 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #19 MOTION to remand filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendants Ervin Cable Construction, LLC, Google Fiber Missouri, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 5/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Meltzer, Hal)
April 19, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc. filed by Robyn M. Butler on behalf of Defendant Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc..(Butler, Robyn)
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ryan J. Shernaman on behalf of Plaintiff Hans Newsom.(Shernaman, Ryan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Vincent F. Igoe, Jr.(Meltzer, Hal)
April 16, 2019 Filing 20 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ervin Cable Construction, LLC, Google Fiber Missouri, LLC. (Meltzer, Hal)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to remand filed by Ryan J. Shernaman on behalf of Hans Newsom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Shernaman, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 Amended ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc..(Butler, Robyn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Eric Van Beber on behalf of Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc. (Attorney Eric Van Beber added to party Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Van Beber, Eric)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.. (Butler, Robyn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Robyn M. Butler on behalf of Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc. (Butler, Robyn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Place of Trial by Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.. (Butler, Robyn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Separate Answer of Def Atlantic Engineering Group to Pl's First Amended Petition ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc..(Butler, Robyn)
March 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Utilisouth, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, COMMON LAW INDEMNITY AND/OR CONTRIBUTION against Utilisouth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Meltzer, Hal)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED Defendant Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #9) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant Atlantic Engineering Group is granted leave to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before March 25, 2019. Signed on 3/18/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robyn M. Butler on behalf of Defendant Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc..(Butler, Robyn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time filed by Robyn M. Butler on behalf of Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Robyn M. Butler added to party Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Butler, Robyn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Gary A. Fenner, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00169-CV-W-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendant Ervin Cable Construction, LLC. (Meltzer, Hal)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/20/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/10/2019. Signed on 3/6/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Defendant Google Fiber Missouri, LLC. (Meltzer, Hal)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Place of Trial by Ervin Cable Construction, LLC. (Meltzer, Hal)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV01693, filed by Hal D. Meltzer on behalf of Ervin Cable Construction, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6206364. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition and state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Google Fiber Missouri, LLC's Consent to removal, #3 Exhibit C- Atlantic Engineering Group. Inc.'s Consent to removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meltzer, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsom v. Ervin Cable Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Newsom
Represented By: Ryan J. Shernaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Fiber Missouri, LLC
Represented By: Hal D. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Engineering Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn M. Butler
Represented By: Eric Van Beber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ervin Cable Construction, LLC
Represented By: Hal D. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Utilisouth, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?