Stillman v. Walmart Stores East I, LP

Plaintiff: Gregory Stillman
Defendant: Walmart Stores East I, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00222
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Stillman filed by Amanda Montee on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Stillman.(Montee, Amanda)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores East I, LP filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 02:00 PM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 5/17/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 motion for protective order. Signed on May 15, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Amanda Montee on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Stillman.(Montee, Amanda)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores East I, LP filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Walmart Stores East I, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marsh, M.)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/7/2019 as Document No. 13, Proposed Scheduling and Trial Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Gregory Stillman. (Montee, Amanda)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to take deposition of Gregory Stillman filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores East I, LP filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint on behalf of Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/14/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/28/2019. Signed on 4/12/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amanda Montee on behalf of Gregory Stillman.(Montee, Amanda)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores East I, LP.(Marsh, M.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Walmart Stores East I, LP (Marsh, M.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by M. Jared Marsh on behalf of Walmart Stores East I, LP (Marsh, M.)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Lindsay P Windham on behalf of Walmart Stores East I, LP (Attorney Lindsay P Windham added to party Walmart Stores East I, LP(pty:dft))(Windham, Lindsay)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County Missouri at Kansas City County, case number 1916-CV02410, Walmart Stores East I, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6232836. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marsh, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillman v. Walmart Stores East I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East I, LP
Represented By: M. Jared Marsh
Represented By: Lindsay P Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stillman
Represented By: Amanda Montee
Represented By: James Albert Montee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?