A.P. v. William Jewell College
Plaintiff: A. P. and A.P.
Defendant: William Jewell College
Case Number: 4:2019cv00351
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of Defendant William Jewell College. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Teeter, Derek)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Plaintiff A.P.. Reply suggestions due by 7/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Hart, Brette)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 6/10/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of William Jewell College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Principal's Recommendation Letter, #2 Exhibit B, Teacher's Recommendation Letter)(Teeter, Derek)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of Defendant William Jewell College. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Teeter, Derek)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of William Jewell College. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Teeter, Derek)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of Defendant William Jewell College.(Teeter, Derek)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before this Court is Defendant's Emergency Motion to Clarify Order (Doc. #6). For good cause stated, the Motion is granted. Defendant, as it agrees to, shall not use Plaintiff's name or other traditional means of identification in court filings and publications, such as media releases, media interviews, communications to the student body, flyers, public forums, and the like. Defendant may use Plaintiff's name while seeking out and speaking to witnesses. Signed on 5/20/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 Emergency MOTION to clarify Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of Defendant William Jewell College. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Teeter, Derek)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to motion re #6 Emergency MOTION to clarify Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Plaintiff A.P.. Reply suggestions due by 5/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hart, Brette)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 On May 16, 2019, Defendant William Jewell College filed its Emergency Motion to Clarify Order and Suggestions in Support. (Doc. #6). Defendant William Jewell asks for "emergency treatment" with respect to the motion. Accordingly, the Court directs Plaintiff to file her response to the motion on or before May 20, 2019. Signed on 5/16/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to clarify Order and Suggestions in Support filed by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of William Jewell College. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Teeter, Derek)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Derek T. Teeter on behalf of William Jewell College (Attorney Derek T. Teeter added to party William Jewell College(pty:dft))(Teeter, Derek)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Before the Court is Plaintiff A.P.'s Motion to Proceed by Pseudonym and Suggestions in Support. (Doc. #3). Based on the totality of the circumstances, the Court finds Plaintiff's claims involve information of the utmost intimacy. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in this matter under the pseudonym "A.P." The Court further orders that Defendant shall not publicly disclose Plaintiff's name or personal identifying information. All parties shall file any documents with this Court either redacted of Plaintiff's name and other personal identifying information or with the use of the pseudonym "A.P." Signed on 5/7/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order (SEALED) to Proceed by Pseudonym and Suggestions in Support filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of A.P.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hart, Brette)
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Jewell College. (Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Moore, Terri)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Jewell College filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6297970. Service due by 8/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Hart, Brette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kern, Kendra). Modified on 5/6/2019 corrected civil cover sheet. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.P. v. William Jewell College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jewell College
Represented By: Derek T. Teeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.
Represented By: Brette S. Hart
Represented By: Bradley L. Akins
Represented By: Matthew William Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?