Tomlin v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Tomlin
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00383
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Court enters a Protective Order. Signed on 7/8/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Cordell, Annette)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for protective order - Unopposed filed by Matthew F. Mulhern on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mulhern, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew F. Mulhern on behalf of Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Mulhern, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Bradford C. Kendall on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey A Tomlin.(Kendall, Bradford)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Mulhern, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 11:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 6/19/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Jeffrey A Tomlin. (Kendall, Bradford)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended from Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV09175, filed by Matthew F. Mulhern on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition+for+Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand Letter)(Mulhern, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Mulhern, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew F. Mulhern on behalf of Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Mulhern, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/1/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 6/17/2019. Signed on 5/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Within 14 days, Defendants shall amend the Notice of Removal to properly allege the parties' citizenship or show cause why the case should not be remanded. See Order for details. Signed on 5/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County of from Tomlin v Allstate County, case number 1916-CV09175, filed by Robert J Luder on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6314202. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition+for+Damages, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand Letter)(Luder, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlin v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Tomlin
Represented By: Bradford C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J Luder
Represented By: Matthew F. Mulhern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?