Sykora et al v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ashley Sykora, Matthew Sykora and Tracy Sykora
Defendant: Joseph Surratt and Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00384
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Anderson, Christy)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #5 motion to remand. This case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, at Kansas City. Signed on 6/19/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to strike , MOTION to change venue , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Maloney on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Clay County Petition, #2 Exhibit Underlying Clay County Judgment, #3 Exhibit DOC Printout, #4 Exhibit Sentence and Judgment)(Maloney, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to First Amended Petition on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Auto Policy)(Maloney, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to remand filed by Grant Rahmeyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rahmeyer, Grant)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Maloney, James)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 5/15/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV05468, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6314298. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in state court)(Maloney, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykora et al v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Sykora
Represented By: Grant Rahmeyer
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sykora
Represented By: Grant Rahmeyer
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Sykora
Represented By: Grant Rahmeyer
Represented By: Steve Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Surratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Maloney
Represented By: Scott David Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?