Sorter v. CSRA LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Sorter
Defendant: David Johnson, CSRI LLC and CSRA LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00403
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's unopposed motion to stay all deadlines in the Rule 16 Notice (Doc. #4). All deadlines in the Rule 16 Notice are stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed on 7/12/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Michael J Gallagher on behalf of Defendants CSRA LLC, David Johnson. Reply suggestions due by 7/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Exerpts)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Gallagher, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With consent, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ortrie D. Smith for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please make not of the new case number 19-00403-CV-W-ODS. Signed on 7/11/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to stay re #4 Rule 16 Notice filed by Mark A. Jess on behalf of Robert Sorter. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Jess, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Gary A. Fenner, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00403-CV-W-FJG. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time to respond to Motion for Remand.Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 6/25/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to File Response to Motion for Remand filed by Michael J Gallagher on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gallagher, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to remand filed by Mark A. Jess on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Deposition)(Jess, Mark)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/12/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/2/2019. Signed on 5/28/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of CSRA LLC filed by Michael J Gallagher on behalf of Defendant CSRA LLC.(Gallagher, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1816-cv-14488, filed by Michael J Gallagher on behalf of CSRI LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6325016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition in State Court, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition, #3 Exhibit Samuel Zurik III, #4 Exhibit Johnson Deposition, #5 Exhibit CSRA LLC Filings, #6 Exhibit CSRA Inc. SEC Filings, #7 Exhibit State Court Notice, #8 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(Gallagher, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorter v. CSRA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sorter
Represented By: Mark A. Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Represented By: Michael J Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSRI LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSRA LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?