Yohn v. EEOC St. Louis Office et al
Plaintiff: Wendy D. Yohn
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, EEOC St. Louis Office and Judge Kendra Howard
Interested Party: US Senator Kamala Harris and US Senator Claire McCaskill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00433
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 19-2597 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Wendy D. Yohn. (Terry, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #6 Notice of Appeal. (Terry, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wendy D. Yohn. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number not paid. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed. Mail sent to Wendy Yohn. (Related document(s) #3 , #4 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy of Judgment mailed with Order #3 . (Anderson, Christy)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - DENYING #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 7/8/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Copy of Order mailed via first class mail to Wendy Yohn, C/O Kim Williams, 719 E. College, Independence, MO 64050. (Anderson, Christy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Wendy D. Yohn. (Woods, Gloria)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wendy D. Yohn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yohn v. EEOC St. Louis Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC St. Louis Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Kendra Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy D. Yohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Senator Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Senator Claire McCaskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?