Bowers v. 435 South, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: 435 South, LLC and Kathy Boos
Case Number: 4:2019cv00437
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 motion for extension of time to complete discovery per entry of #13 Rule 16 Notice. Signed on 7/25/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/25/2019. Signed on 7/25/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery filed by Michael A. Millett on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Millett, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition to motion for summary judgment re #8 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Michael A. Millett on behalf of Defendants 435 South, LLC, Kathy Boos. Reply suggestions due by 8/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Millett, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to motion re #8 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Michael A. Millett on behalf of Defendants 435 South, LLC, Kathy Boos. Reply suggestions due by 8/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Millett, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit mayors_christmas_tree_crown_center_kansas_city-1, #2 Exhibit va1-967-366Bowers2013, #3 Exhibit roasters_block_kc_oreilly_dev_folgers_plant-19, #4 Exhibit va2-026-446, #5 Exhibit mayors_lights_screen_shot_435_mag, #6 Exhibit roaters_block_screen_shot_435_mag)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Voytas, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Voytas, Richard)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant 435 South, LLC's answer due 7/16/2019; Defendant Kathy Boos' answer due 7/16/2019. Signed on 7/3/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading filed by Michael A. Millett on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael A. Millett added to party 435 South, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A. Millett added to party Kathy Boos(pty:dft))(Millett, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. 435 South, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Kathy Boos served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
June 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 435 South, LLC, Kathy Boos. (Woods, Gloria)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark - AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy sent to Register of Copyrights via first class mail. (Woods, Gloria)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 435 South, LLC, Kathy Boos filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6344079. Service due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. 435 South, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 435 South, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Millett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Boos
Represented By: Michael A. Millett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Ethan William Gee
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?